+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned for SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY
- Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 48 - 25 section 2934, sub-section 1
- Chapter 48 - 25 section 2934-A
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor