+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Subsequently, On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES