+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (75)
On May 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-534) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-606) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On motion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 811 Yeas 18 - Nays 12 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Requested
- Senator POULIOT of Kennebec asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion for a Roll Call.
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-534)
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-606) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-534) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-534) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-606) thereto ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-534) was ADOPTED
- On motion by Senator GUERIN of Penobscot Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 802 Yeas 18 - Nays 11 - Excused 5 - Absent 0
- Sent down for concurrence
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-534) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-606) thereto.
- ROLL CALL NO. 606
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- (Yeas 68 - Nays 54 - Absent 25 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4)
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reports Read
- On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 553
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-534) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-534)
- Sent down for concurrence
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 742 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 58 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4)
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 56 - Absent 14 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4)
- ROLL CALL NO. 556
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-534).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-534) was READ and ADOPTED.
On April 11, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On March 25, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- Senator STEWART of Aroostook asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion.
- Motion by Senator BENNETT of Oxford to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 627 Yeas 13 - Nays 19 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Majority REFER to the Committee on HEALTH and HUMAN SERVICES Report Accepted
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 628 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
- Motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc to Reconsider whereby the Majority REF to the Committee on HEALTH and HUMAN SERVICES Report was Accepted FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 629 Yeas 4 - Nays 28 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook Objection to Suspend the Rules to Forthwith Bill.
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Moved that the Majority REFER to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Sent down for concurrence
- Subsequently The Majority REFER to the Committee on HEALTH and HUMAN SERVICES was ACCEPTED
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town to RECONSIDER whereby the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES FAILED.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- (Yeas 53 - Nays 76 - Absent 19 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3)
- ROLL CALL NO. 485
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- RELEASED.
- HELD.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES In concurrence.
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority REFER to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 23, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - REFFERED/ ONTP
On March 8, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 7, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On June 4, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 738 - 22 section 3174-III
+ − Votes (10)
April 25, 2022: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 25
April 25, 2022: PASS TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMEND
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 5
April 25, 2022: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 12, 2022: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
April 12, 2022: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 12
April 12, 2022: Enactment
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 14
March 24, 2022: ACCEPT MAJ OTP RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2022: INDEFINITELY POSTPONE
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2022: RECONSIDER
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 76
- Absent: 19
March 24, 2022: RECONSIDER
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Catherine BREEN
Type:
Primary Sponsor