+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-147), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-147) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-147) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-147).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor