+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-90).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-90) .
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-90) READ and ADOPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph AAA
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph LL
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph N
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph P
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph TT
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph UU
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph VV
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph WW
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph XX
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph YY
- Chapter 121 - 12 section 12803, sub-section 3, paragraph ZZ
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor