+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-70).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-70)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-70) READ and ADOPTEDASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES
- Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4401, sub-section 4
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4401, sub-section 4, paragraph B
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4401, sub-section 4, paragraph E
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4401, sub-section 4, paragraph F
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4401, sub-section 4, paragraph G
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4402, sub-section 4
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4402, sub-section 5, paragraph D
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4402, sub-section 6
- Chapter 104 - 30-A section 4406, sub-section 1, paragraph B