+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- PREVAILED
- (30 -Yeas, 4 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 243
- On motion by Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec, the Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT.
- Reports READ.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 127 - Nays 17 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 223
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative GRAHAM of North Yarmouth, the Minority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Later today assigned.
- Unfinished Business
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT, in concurrence.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 357 - 34-B section 3612
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2013: ACCEPT MIN OTP RPT
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 6, 2013: ACC MIN OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 127
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 7