+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-110).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-110) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-110).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On May 19, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On April 13, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc the Bill was REFFERED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
- Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 150 - 9-A section 8-509, sub-section 2
- Chapter 150 - 5 section 1509-A
+ − Sponsors (4)
Benjamin CHIPMAN
Type:
Primary Sponsor