+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-7), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-7) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-7).
On March 8, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On February 19, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 27 - 12 section 6706, sub-section 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor