+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Possession of the Senate Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-56) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-56), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-56).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
- Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 36 section 1760, sub-section 103
- Chapter null - 36 section 2557, sub-section 39
- Chapter null - 36 section 2557, sub-section 38
- Chapter null - 36 section 2557, sub-section 40
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor