+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE, in concurrence.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 93 - 12 section 10853, sub-section 16