+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-135).
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Reports Read
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 3 - Excused 2)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 103
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-135) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-135).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 16, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor