+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-192), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-192) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-192)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Cyrway of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs, in concurrence.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 175 - 37-B section 504, sub-section 4, paragraph H
- Chapter 175 - 37-B section 509, sub-section 2, paragraph F
- Chapter 175 - 37-B section 509, sub-section 2, paragraph G
- Chapter 175 - 37-B section 509, sub-section 2, paragraph H
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor