+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- PREVAILED
- (24 -Yeas, 10 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 1 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 43
- On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending the motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
- Senator MAZUREK of Knox moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 31
- (Yeas 104 - Nays 38 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Representative THERIAULT of Madawaska moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION, in concurrence.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 1
April 9, 2013: Acc Maj Ought Not to Pass Rep
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor