+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (50)
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- LD 677 In Senate, July 19, 2021, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 19 and 14, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
On July 2, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 66 - Nays 55 - Absent 30 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 423
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED FAILED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 404
- (Yeas 72 - Nays 72 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 456 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED and the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-215) AND House Amendment "A" (H-584) in concurrence
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-215) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Unfinished Business
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 377
- (Yeas 71 - Nays 63 - Absent 17 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-215) and House Amendment "A" (H-584)
- ROLL CALL NO. 378
- (Yeas 73 - Nays 60 - Absent 18 - Excused 0)
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, House Amendment "A" (H-584) was READ and ADOPTED.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Representative SYLVESTER of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Later today assigned.
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-215)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-215) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 267 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On June 8, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 2, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- Chapter null - 26 section 1285, sub-section 5, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 26 section 1285, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 26 section 1026, sub-section 4, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 26 section 1026, sub-section 4, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 26 section 1026, sub-section 4, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 26 section 1026, sub-section 4, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 26 section 979-D, sub-section 4, paragraph G
- Chapter null - 26 section 979-D, sub-section 4, paragraph F
- Chapter null - 26 section 979-D, sub-section 4, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 26 section 979-D, sub-section 4, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 26 section 965, sub-section 4-A
- Chapter null - 26 section 965, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 26 section 1026, sub-section 4, paragraph F
- Chapter null - 26 section 979-D, sub-section 4, paragraph H
+ − Votes (7)
July 19, 2021: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
July 1, 2021: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 30
June 30, 2021: Enactment
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 72
- Absent: 7
June 17, 2021: Acc Maj OTP as Amended Rep
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 63
- Absent: 17
June 17, 2021: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
June 17, 2021: PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 60
- Absent: 18
June 9, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (4)
Troy JACKSON
Type:
Primary Sponsor