+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- LD 675 In Senate, July 19, 2021, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 and 14, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- (Yeas 81 - Nays 58 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 322
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "B" (S-290) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-290).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-290) Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Taken from the table by the President
- Sent down for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 373 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "B" (S-290) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-290)
On June 14, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 27, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On May 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 2, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter null - 5 section 2037
- Chapter null - 5 section 2036
- Chapter null - 5 section 2035
+ − Votes (3)
July 19, 2021: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
June 16, 2021: ACC REPORT 'A' OTP as amend
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 12
June 15, 2021: ACCEPT RPT 'A' OTP-B
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Ned CLAXTON
Type:
Primary Sponsor