+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-215).
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 126 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- Subsequently, On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Taken from the table by the President
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Roll Call Ordered
- Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to Accept the Minority Ought Not To Pass , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Reports READ
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- (Yeas 84 - Nays 61 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 139
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-215) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-215).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
June 2, 2015: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 61
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor