+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-158), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-158) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-158).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.