+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-167) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-167).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-167).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 2, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (4)
Richard BENNETT
Type:
Primary Sponsor