+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- On further motion of same Representative the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Augusta, the House RECEDED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE In NON-CONCURRENCE
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter null - 29-A section 501, paragraph 2
- Chapter null - 12 section 10853, sub-section 18
- Chapter null - 29-A section 524-B, sub-section 1