+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- LD 660 In Senate, June 15, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 19 IN FAVOR and 16 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 107 having voted in the affirmative and 35 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 239V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-189) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-189), in concurrence.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-189)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Woodsome of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
- Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 15, 2015: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 35
- Absent: 9
June 15, 2015: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16
June 15, 2015: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16