+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-170) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-170), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-170).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
- Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor