+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ROLL CALL NO. 651V
- This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 93 having voted in the affirmative and 55 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- FINALLY PASSED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-502) thereto
- ROLL CALL NO. 602
- (Yeas 103 - Nays 45 - Absent 3 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-502) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-502) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-502) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) READ and ADOPTED
- Under further suspension of the Rules, On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) was ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-528).
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-528), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Reports READ
- Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-528).
- READ the Second Time.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2016: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 3
April 12, 2016: Final Passage
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor