+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- (Yeas 89 - Nays 55 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 505
- Reports READ.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-370).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-370) was READ and ADOPTED.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-370) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-370)
- Sent down for concurrence
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS
- Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 6, 2018: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor