+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-164).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- Report ACCEPTED. (Roll Call Ordered)
- Roll Call Number 159
- (35 -Yeas, 0 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- PREVAILED
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-164) READ and ADOPTED .
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-164)..
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF REPORT.
- Report READ.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Boyle of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES
- Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 242 - 38 section 436-A, sub-section 1-B
- Chapter 242 - 38 section 439-B, sub-section 3
+ − Vote
June 5, 2013: ACCEPTANCE OF REPORT
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor