+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-75).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-75) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-75) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-75) .
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Cyrway of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 106 - 28-A section 163, sub-section 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor