+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-487).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-487) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 85 - Nays 64 - Absent 2 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 615
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-487) Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
- Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 665 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-487)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-487) READ and ADOPTED
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Reports READ
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Bill was TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
- Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2016: REMOVE FROM AFA TABLE
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2016: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 2
April 12, 2016: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 18
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor