+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-18).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-18).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-18) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 36 - 14 section 6111, sub-section 1-A, paragraph B
- Chapter 36 - 14 section 6111, sub-section 1-A, paragraph F
- Chapter 36 - 14 section 6111, sub-section 1-A, paragraph G
- Chapter 36 - 14 section 6111, sub-section 1-A, paragraph H
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor