+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (74)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- Committee of Conference Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate INSISTED and JOINED in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "C" (H-638) and ASKED for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE.
- (Yeas 51 - Nays 89 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 639
- Motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco to INSIST FAILED.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 532 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin moved to Accept the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Reports READ
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Unfinished Business
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- ROLL CALL NO. 598
- (Yeas 48 - Nays 89 - Absent 14 - Excused 0)
- Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "C" (H-638) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "C" (H-638).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Representative HOBBINS of Saco moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in NON-CONCURRENCE. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- Roll Call Number 322
- (19 -Yeas, 16 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 391
- (Yeas 78 - Nays 68 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Embden, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT.
- Reports READ.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- (Yeas 49 - Nays 89 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended FAILED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 340
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-527) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-527).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY, in concurrence.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
- Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 4, 2014: INSIST
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 89
- Absent: 11
April 3, 2014: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
March 31, 2014: Acc Min Ought Not to Pass Rep
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 89
- Absent: 14
June 19, 2013: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 68
- Absent: 5
June 19, 2013: COMMIT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16
June 17, 2013: ACC REPORT 'B' OTP AS AMEND
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 89
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor