+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- 83 having voted in the affirmative and 58 in the negative, with 10 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 330V
- This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-236) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-236), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-236)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, in concurrence.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 17, 2013: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor