+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-98).
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 124 Yeas 16 - Nays 15 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Reports Read
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 81 - Nays 65 - Absent 4 - Excused 1)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 78
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-98) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-98).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 4
May 9, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 65
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor