+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- PREVAILED
- (34 -Yeas, 1 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 95
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-112), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-112) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-112).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION, in concurrence.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 188 - 29-A section 2119, sub-section 3
+ − Vote
May 21, 2013: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor