+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- RELEASED.
- Held at the Request of THIBODEAU of Waldo .
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- HELD at the Request of Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo.
- On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION, in concurrence.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Speaker laid before the House
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor