+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-139) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-139).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-139).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 1, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On April 20, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 22, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 36 section 653, sub-section 1, paragraph M
- Chapter null - 36 section 653, sub-section 1, paragraph L
+ − Sponsors (4)
Troy JACKSON
Type:
Primary Sponsor