+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- EnactmentIn Senate, June 14, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 27 in the Affirmative and 8 in the Nagative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- 107 having voted in the affirmative and 39 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 413V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 292
- (Yeas 101 - Nays 48 - Absent 2 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-445) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-445).
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-445) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-445), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- On OBJECTION of Representative WILLETTE of Mapleton REMOVED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Later today assigned.
- The Committee Report was READ.
- On motion of Representative WILLETTE of Mapleton, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report.
- Unfinished Business
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT, in concurrence.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter 370 - 33 section 751, sub-section 1
- Chapter 370 - 33 section 751, sub-section 9
- Chapter 370 - 33 section 751, sub-section 14-B
- Chapter 370 - 33 section 751, sub-section 14-D
- Chapter 370 - 33 section 751, sub-section 14-E
- Chapter 370 - 33 section 753
+ − Votes (3)
June 26, 2013: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 5
June 26, 2013: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
June 12, 2013: Acc Ought to Pass as Amend Rep
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor