+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-91), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-91) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-91).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 96 - 12 section 11154, sub-section 5
- Chapter 96 - 12 section 11154, sub-section 7