+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-458) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-458), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-458).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 81, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 81, sub-section 14
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 96, sub-section 3
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 96, sub-section 4
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 96, sub-section 7
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 96, sub-section 8
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 96, sub-section 10
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 96, sub-section 12, paragraph C
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 97, sub-section 4, paragraph A
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 97, sub-section 4, paragraph I
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 97, sub-section 4, paragraph L
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 97, sub-section 4, paragraph N
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 97, sub-section 4, paragraph R
- Chapter 207 - 7 section 100, sub-section 1