+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On May 14, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP
On May 10, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - ONTP
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 22, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor