+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-138) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-138) in concurrence
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-138).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor