+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-43).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-43).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-43) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Tuttle of York REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 118 - 8 section 1036, sub-section 2, paragraph F
- Chapter 118 - 8 section 1036, sub-section 2-A, paragraph B