+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor