+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Possession of the Senate Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-223).
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-223) READ and ADOPTED.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-223).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter null - 22 section 3174-BBB