+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Subsequently The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of Report B Ought Not To Pass
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 170 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook the RECEDE and CONCUR motion FAILED
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
- Unfinished Business
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-49).
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 127 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Report B Ought Not To Pass was ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Taken from the table by the President
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Unfinished Business
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 76 - Nays 67 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 60
- Speaker laid before the House
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-49).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 24, 2017: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 19
May 11, 2017: ACCEPT RPT 'B' ONTP
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2017: ACC REPORT 'A' OTP AS AMEND
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor