+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-460).
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-460) READ and ADOPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-460).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 25, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 2, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 28, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 17, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3160
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3159
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3158
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3157
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3156
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3155
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3154
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3153
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3152
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3151
- Chapter 562 - 24-A section 3161
+ − Sponsor
Heather SANBORN
Type:
Primary Sponsor