+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Possession of the Senate Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) READ and ADOPTED
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-83).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6705
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6703
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6701
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6702
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6704
- Chapter null - 20-A section
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor