+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- LD 463 In Senate, June 29, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 122 having voted in the affirmative and 17 in the negative, with 11 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 416V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- in concurrence
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-487), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-487).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 281 - 30-A section 701, sub-section 2-C
+ − Votes (2)
June 29, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 122
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 11
June 29, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1