+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-263) thereto.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
- Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec Senate Amendment "B" (S-263) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-263) thereto ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-263) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) READ
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence
- Unfinished Business
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Speaker laid before the House
- ROLL CALL NO. 195
- (Yeas 68 - Nays 74 - Absent 8 - Excused 1)
- On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) was ADOPTED.
- On motion of Representative CHACE of Durham, House Amendment "A" (H-335) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) thereto was ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-208) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-335) thereto.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 31, 2017: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 74
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8