+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-327) thereto ADOPTED
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108)
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) was ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-327) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) READ and ADOPTED
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-327) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-327) thereto.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108).
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 6602, sub-section 12
- Chapter 511 - 20-A section 6602, sub-section 12
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor