+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 81 having voted in the affirmative and 65 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 268V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- LD 45 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 2 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-88).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-88)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 65
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 7, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor