+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-47), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-47) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator DUTREMBLE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-47).
- READ the Second Time.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-47) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative SHAW of Standish, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Dutremble of York, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor